Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Agostini

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1825Born
26 Jan 185125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
27 Oct 187146.4AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
17 Dec 187146.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
17 Mar 187246.7InstalledBishop of Chioggia, Italy
22 Jun 187752.0AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
27 Mar 188256.8Elevated to Cardinal
30 Mar 188256.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
7 Jun 188661.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
31 Dec 189166.5DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Agostini (VIAF: 88967564)
Domenico Cardinal Agostini (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreviso, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained PriestSeminary of Venice, TrinitÓ, Chapel, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSte Marie della Salute, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)Chapel of the Canons, S. Michele, Cemetery, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 210, and Page 585
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 48, and Page 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Mar 1882
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017