Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Tomasi

Bishop of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1965 Born
28 Jun 199832.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
6 Jul 201953.9AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
14 Sep 201954.1Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
6 Oct 201954.2InstalledBishop of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Tomasi
Bishop Michele Tomasi (born ) Bishop of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBolzano, Diocese of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}
Ordained DeaconCathedral, Bressanone, Diocese of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Bressanone, Diocese of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bressanone, Diocese of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Treviso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jul 2019
  • c01/loc: AM, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 16 Sep 2019

Quantcast