Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Severino Cardinal Poletto

Archbishop Emeritus of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe in via Trionfale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1933 Born
29 Jun 195724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Casale Monferrato, Italy
3 Apr 198047.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fossano, Italy
17 May 198047.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Fossano, Italy
22 Jun 198047.2InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Fossano, Italy
29 Oct 198047.6SucceededBishop of Fossano, Italy
16 Mar 198955.9AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
11 Jun 198956.2InstalledBishop of Asti, Italy
19 Jun 199966.2AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
5 Sep 199966.4InstalledArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Feb 200167.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200167.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe in via Trionfale
11 Oct 201077.5RetiredArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Severino Poletto (VIAF: 264134382)
Severino Cardinal Poletto (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalgareda, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained PriestCasale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato
Ordained BishopCathedral, Casale Monferrato, Diocese of Casale Monferrato

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • i/loc: AM, 18 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Aug 2018

Quantcast