Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Morosini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1665Born
3 May 169226.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
4 May 169226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Apr 171044.3AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
27 Apr 171044.4Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
15 Mar 172357.2AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
25 Jun 172761.5DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Morosini
Bishop Fortunato Morosini O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopGesù, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSanta Giustina, Monastery, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Giustina, Monastery, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 127, and Page 370
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 21
  • ob/c2: AT, 22 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 23 Jul 2018

Quantcast