Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro de Lellis

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1462AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
17 Sep 1464AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
31 Mar 1466³DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodoro de Lellis
Bishop Teodoro de Lellis (died ) Bishop of Treviso

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 153, and Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast