Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Daniel

Bishop Emeritus of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1933 Born
24 Jun 195622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
27 Nov 199764.1AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
13 Dec 199764.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
6 Jan 199864.2InstalledBishop of Chioggia, Italy
10 Jan 200975.2RetiredBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Daniel
Bishop Angelo Daniel (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontebelluna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chioggia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,178

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast