Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bianchin

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Vannida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1936Born
29 Jun 196124.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 198750.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vannida
25 Apr 198750.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vannida
22 Jan 199154.3DiedTitular Bishop of Vannida

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bianchin
Bishop Antonio Bianchin (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Vannida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillorba, Italy

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast