Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bl. Andrea Giacinto Bonaventura Longhin, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1863Born
4 Oct 188319.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Jun 188622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Apr 190440.4AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
17 Apr 190440.4Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
6 Aug 190440.7InstalledBishop of Treviso, Italy
24 Mar 192359.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Padova {Padua}, Italy
7 Oct 192359.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Padova {Padua}, Italy
19 Dec 192764.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Udine, Italy
4 Oct 192864.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Treviso, Italy
4 Oct 192864.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
14 Oct 192864.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Udine, Italy
26 Jun 193672.5DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy
20 Oct 2002Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Andrea Giacinto Bonaventura Longhin
(VIAF: 27242616; WikiData: Q3615755)
Archbishop Bl. Andrea Giacinto Bonaventura Longhin O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFiumicello di Campodarsego, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopTrinitÓ dei Monti, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Treviso, Diocese of Treviso

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1904, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 357
  • qfmc/i/aadm: CB, 13 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 15 Jul 2024