Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Pavan

Deceased

Priest of Treviso, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of San Francesco di Paola ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1903Born
8 Jul 192824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
25 May 198581.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198581.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Francesco di Paola ai Monti
26 Dec 199491.3DiedPriest of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Pavan (VIAF: 84003179)
Pietro Cardinal Pavan (born , died ) Priest of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreviso, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained PriestTreviso, Diocese of Treviso
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Daughters of the Church Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a cardinal for 9.5 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 25 May 1985

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 1 Oct 2020

Quantcast