Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Beccegato

Deceased

Bishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1862Born
10 Apr 188623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
19 May 191754.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ceneda, Italy
19 May 191754.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
17 Jun 191754.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
29 Aug 191754.6AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
17 Nov 194380.9DiedBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Beccegato
Bishop Eugenio Beccegato (born , died ) Bishop of Vittorio Veneto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFossalta Padovana

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,917, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast