Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Giacomo d’Acri, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Zanetto de Udine)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 May 1469AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
1474²AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
1475²ResignedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor
6 Apr 1478AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Treviso, Italy
15 Feb 1485DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo d’Acri
Archbishop Giovanni Giacomo d’Acri O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Treviso

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 240, and Page 249
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1474, Number 55*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Nov 2018

Quantcast