Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Morao Andreazza, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Chalatenango


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1939 BornTreviso, Italy
17 Sep 196425.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 196627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Jun 199757.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of El Salvador, Military
12 Nov 200364.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador
12 Nov 200364.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tullia
17 Jan 200464.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tullia
21 Apr 200767.8AppointedBishop of Chalatenango, El Salvador
14 Jul 201677.0RetiredBishop of Chalatenango, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Luis Morao Andreazza
Bishop Luis Morao Andreazza O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chalatenango

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chalatenango.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,513
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Oct 2016