Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Callegari

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1841Born
19 Dec 186322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
26 Mar 186422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
27 Feb 188038.3AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
9 May 188038.5Ordained BishopBishop of Treviso, Italy
25 Sep 188240.8AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
9 Nov 190362.0Elevated to Cardinal
12 Nov 190362.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
14 Apr 190664.4DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Callegari (VIAF: 64013700)
Giuseppe Cardinal Callegari (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained PriestVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSan Marco, Cathedral, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlacePadua, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Buried Place (Original)Shrine d'Arcella, Padua, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
  • a cardinal for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Nov 1903
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 444, and Page 538
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017