Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmond Djitangar

Archbishop of N’Djaména


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1952 BornBekoro
30 Dec 197826.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 199138.9AppointedBishop of Sarh, Chad
2 Feb 199239.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sarh, Chad
20 Aug 201663.7AppointedArchbishop of N’Djaména, Chad

MicroData Summary for Edmond Djitangar
Archbishop Edmond Djitangar (born ) Archbishop of N’Djaména

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of N’Djaména.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,612
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Aug 2016