Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothée Modibo-Nzockena

Deceased

Bishop of Franceville


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1950BornMbomo
22 Jun 198030.4Ordained PriestPriest of Franceville, Gabon
8 Nov 199646.8AppointedBishop of Franceville, Gabon
11 Jan 199747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Franceville, Gabon
24 Mar 201666.2DiedBishop of Franceville, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Timothée Modibo-Nzockena
Bishop Timothée Modibo-Nzockena (born , died ) Bishop of Franceville

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,910
  • d: CB, 25 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Mar 2016