Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Yemboaro Ouédraogo

Archbishop of Bobo-Dioulasso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1948 BornTreichville
20 Jul 197426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso
24 Jan 199748.7AppointedBishop of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
18 May 199749.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fada N’Gourma, Burkina Faso
13 Nov 201062.5AppointedArchbishop of Bobo-Dioulasso, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Paul Yemboaro Ouédraogo:
Archbishop Paul Yemboaro Ouédraogo (born ) Archbishop of Bobo-Dioulasso

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bobo-Dioulasso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,004

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013