Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yohannes Woldegiorgis

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Meki

Titular Bishop of Forma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1921BornAlitena
31 Oct 195432.8Ordained PriestPriest of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
8 Sep 198159.7AppointedPrefect of Meki, Ethiopia
21 Dec 199170.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Forma
21 Dec 199170.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Meki, Ethiopia
3 May 199270.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forma
19 Sep 200280.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Meki, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Yohannes Woldegiorgis:
Bishop Yohannes Woldegiorgis (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Meki

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,771
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2003, Page 1,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013