Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janvier Kataka Luvete

Bishop of Wamba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1947 BornNgunda
18 Aug 197427.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 199649.6AppointedBishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Jun 199750.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wamba, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Janvier Kataka Luvete:
Bishop Janvier Kataka Luvete (born ) Bishop of Wamba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013