Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marek Forgáč

Auxiliary Bishop of Košice, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Seleuciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1974 Born
19 Jun 199925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Košice, Slovakia
11 Jun 201642.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Košice, Slovakia
11 Jun 201642.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Seleuciana
1 Sep 201642.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Seleuciana

MicroData Summary for Marek Forgáč (VIAF: 306414604)
Bishop Marek Forgáč (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Košice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKošice
Ordained BishopSainte Elizabeth, Cathedral, Košice, Archdiocese of Košice

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Košice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 15 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 28 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,088

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast