Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amedeus Msarikie

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Moshi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1931BornKirua
8 Aug 196129.9Ordained PriestPriest of Moshi, Tanzania
21 Mar 198654.6AppointedBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
1 May 198654.7Ordained BishopBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
21 Nov 200776.2RetiredBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
7 Feb 201381.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Moshi, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Amedeus Msarikie:
Bishop Amedeus Msarikie (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Moshi

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2007
  • d: CB, 7 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014