Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Ireri Mukobo, I.M.C.

Vicar Apostolic of Isiolo

Titular Bishop of Rusguniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1949 BornMufu
5 Jan 198030.3Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
22 Dec 199950.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nairobi, Kenya
22 Dec 199950.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusguniae
18 Mar 200050.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusguniae
25 Jan 200656.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Isiolo, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Anthony Ireri Mukobo:
Bishop Anthony Ireri Mukobo I.M.C. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Isiolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Isiolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,714

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013