Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frédéric Rubwejanga

Bishop Emeritus of Kibungo, Rwanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1931 Born
20 Sep 195928.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 199261.2AppointedBishop of Kibungo, Rwanda
5 Jul 199261.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kibungo, Rwanda
28 Aug 200776.6RetiredBishop of Kibungo, Rwanda

MicroData Summary for Frédéric Rubwejanga
Bishop Frédéric Rubwejanga (born 1931) Bishop Emeritus of Kibungo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyabinyenga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kibungo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Aug 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,979
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,052

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast