Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop František Tondra

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Spiš, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1936Born
1 Jul 196226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Spiš, Slovakia
26 Jul 198953.1AppointedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
9 Sep 198953.2Ordained BishopBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
4 Aug 201175.1RetiredBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
3 May 201275.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Spiš, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for František Tondra
Bishop František Tondra (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Spiš

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpišske Vlachy

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,468
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast