Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Koffi Seshie

Deceased

Bishop of Kpalimé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1942BornAzahoun
4 May 196926.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 199451.9AppointedBishop of Kpalimé, Togo
15 Oct 199452.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kpalimé, Togo
25 Apr 200057.7DiedBishop of Kpalimé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Pierre Koffi Seshie:
Bishop Pierre Koffi Seshie (born , died ) Bishop of Kpalimé

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,445
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013