Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Virgilio Pante, I.M.C.

Bishop of Maralal, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1946 Born
26 Dec 197024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
15 Jun 200155.2AppointedBishop of Maralal, Kenya
6 Oct 200155.5Ordained BishopBishop of Maralal, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Virgilio Pante
Bishop Virgilio Pante I.M.C. (born ) Bishop of Maralal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Maralal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,066

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast