Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Locati

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Isiolo

Titular Bishop of Zica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1928BornVinzaglio
29 Jun 195223.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 199567.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Isiolo, Kenya
15 Dec 199567.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zica
4 Feb 199667.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zica
14 Jul 200577.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Isiolo, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Luigi Locati:
Bishop Luigi Locati (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Isiolo

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,681
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013