Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Harrington, S.M.A.

Bishop Emeritus of Lodwar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1939 BornKilmeague, Ireland
16 Dec 196425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
17 Feb 200060.4AppointedBishop of Lodwar, Kenya
20 Mar 200060.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lodwar, Kenya
5 Mar 201171.5ResignedBishop of Lodwar, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Harrington:
Bishop Patrick Joseph Harrington S.M.A. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lodwar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lodwar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,721
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013