Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Kwaku Mensah

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kumasi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1935BornAssamang
3 Jun 197338.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kumasi, Ghana
3 Mar 199560.0AppointedBishop of Obuasi, Ghana
28 May 199560.3Ordained BishopBishop of Obuasi, Ghana
26 Mar 200873.1AppointedArchbishop of Kumasi, Ghana
15 May 201277.2RetiredArchbishop of Kumasi, Ghana
10 Apr 201681.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kumasi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Thomas Kwaku Mensah
Archbishop Thomas Kwaku Mensah (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kumasi

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,559
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2012
  • d: CB, 12 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Apr 2016