Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Dovi Hounnaké

Deceased

Bishop of Aného, Togo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1937Born
10 Jan 196628.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 199457.0AppointedBishop of Aného, Togo
15 Oct 199457.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aného, Togo
4 Aug 199558.1DiedBishop of Aného, Togo

MicroData Summary for Victor Dovi Hounnaké
Bishop Victor Dovi Hounnaké (born , died ) Bishop of Aného

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAfanya-Gbleta

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,444
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast