Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philip Arnold Subira Anyolo

Archbishop of Kisumu, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1956 Born
15 Oct 198327.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 199539.5AppointedBishop of Kericho, Kenya
3 Feb 199639.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kericho, Kenya
22 Mar 200346.8AppointedBishop of Homa Bay, Kenya
23 May 200347.0InstalledBishop of Homa Bay, Kenya
15 Nov 201862.4AppointedArchbishop of Kisumu, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Philip Arnold Subira Anyolo
Archbishop Philip Arnold Subira Anyolo (born ) Archbishop of Kisumu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTongaren
Ordained BishopKericho, Diocese of Kericho

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kisumu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,706
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Nov 2018

Quantcast