Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Kipng’eno Arap Korir

Deceased

Bishop of Eldoret, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1950Born
6 Nov 198232.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 199039.7AppointedBishop of Eldoret, Kenya
2 Jun 199039.9Ordained BishopBishop of Eldoret, Kenya
30 Oct 201767.3DiedBishop of Eldoret, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Kipng’eno Arap Korir
Bishop Cornelius Kipng’eno Arap Korir (born , died ) Bishop of Eldoret

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegutiet
Ordained BishopStade Kipchoge, Eldoret, Diocese of Eldoret
Death PlaceMoi Teaching and Referral, Hospital, Eldoret, Diocese of Eldoret

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,972
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,590
  • d: CB, 30 Oct 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast