Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John ’Oke Afareha

Bishop of Warri, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1947 Born
30 Dec 197326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Warri, Nigeria
3 Mar 199749.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warri, Nigeria
3 Mar 199749.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mina
14 May 199750.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mina
29 Mar 201063.0AppointedBishop of Warri, Nigeria
30 Mar 201063.0InstalledBishop of Warri, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for John ’Oke Afareha
Bishop John ’Oke Afareha (born ) Bishop of Warri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOleh
Ordained BishopWarri, Diocese of Warri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Warri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,000
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018