Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Ceresoli, M.C.C.I.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Awasa

Titular Bishop of Fallaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1931 BornNave
2 Apr 196028.9Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
20 Dec 199362.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Awasa, Ethiopia
20 Dec 199362.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Fallaba
19 Mar 199462.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fallaba
21 Mar 200977.8RetiredVicar Apostolic of Awasa, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Ceresoli:
Bishop Lorenzo Ceresoli M.C.C.I. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Awasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Awasa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013