Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Buschi

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1732BornCesena
26 Oct 176634.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 178552.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
24 Apr 178552.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
11 Aug 180067.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ferentino, Italy
23 Sep 181380.9DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Buschi:
Archbishop Nicola Buschi (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016