Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Maria Freda

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1740BornFoggia
24 Sep 176322.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179757.0SelectedBishop of Lucera, Italy
29 Jan 179857.3ConfirmedBishop of Lucera, Italy
2 Feb 179857.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
1816¹75.2DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Maria Freda
Bishop Alfonso Maria Freda (born , died 1816) Bishop of Lucera

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Mar 2016