Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Moscardini

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1749Born
25 Jul 178435.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Aug 178435.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 179646.9AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
10 Jul 179647.0Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
19 Aug 181869.1DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Moscardini
Bishop Marco Antonio Moscardini (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlacePofi

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast