Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Angeluni, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1738Born
14 Aug 179557.0AppointedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
23 Aug 179557.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
31 Mar 181677.6DiedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Angeluni
Archbishop Giuseppe Angeluni O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo)

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1808, Page 185
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast