Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio David

Deceased

Bishop of Narni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1743Born
19 Sep 176724.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 179652.9AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
10 Jul 179652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
14 Jun 181874.9DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio David
Bishop Antonio David (born , died ) Bishop of Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 301
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast