Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rocco Coiro

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1744BornVignola
19 Dec 176723.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 179753.0SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
18 Dec 179753.2ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
21 Dec 179753.2Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
Mar 1812³67.4DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rocco Coiro
Bishop Rocco Coiro (born , died Mar 1812) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016