Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Saverio Granata, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1741BornMessina
22 Dec 176423.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
1 Jun 176524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
12 May 179554.0SelectedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
1 Jun 179554.0ConfirmedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
7 Jun 179554.0Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
29 Apr 181775.9DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Saverio Granata
Bishop Saverio Granata C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016