Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Mercati

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1718³BornZante
19 Sep 174123.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 178567.4AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
2 Oct 178567.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
1804¹85.6DiedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Mercati:
Bishop Francesco Mercati (born , died 1804) Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016