Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Peruzzi

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1746BornVenezia
22 Dec 177024.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 179548.7SelectedBishop of Caorle, Italy
22 Sep 179548.8ConfirmedBishop of Caorle, Italy
27 Sep 179548.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
11 Jan 180760.1SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
18 Sep 180760.8ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
8 Dec 181569.0SelectedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
26 Jun 181871.5ConfirmedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
25 Nov 183084.0DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Peruzzi
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Peruzzi (born , died ) Bishop of Vicenza

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 153, and Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Sep 2016