Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Leggio, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1737³Born
3 Jun 175618.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Mar 176123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
31 Oct 179759.8SelectedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
18 Dec 179760.0ConfirmedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
21 Dec 179760.0Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
18 Jul 180163.5DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Leggio
Bishop Isidoro Leggio C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant’Angelo a Fasanella

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 425
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast