Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Saverio Passari

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia

Apostolic Administrator of Ancona e Numana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1744³BornFermo
18 Sep 178642.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
26 Nov 178642.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
21 Nov 180056.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ancona e Numana, Italy
4 Jun 180864.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Passari
Archbishop Francesco Saverio Passari (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 82, and Page 254
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,462
  • bp/ob: CB, 6 Nov 2015
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016