Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginaldo Coppola, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1730Born
14 Oct 175322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Oct 179766.9SelectedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
18 Dec 179767.0ConfirmedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
21 Dec 179767.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
7 Feb 181079.2DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Reginaldo Coppola
Bishop Reginaldo Coppola O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltomorate

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 275
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast