Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Fedele Grisolia

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Severina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1739BornMormanno
5 Jun 176223.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 179758.6AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
21 Dec 179758.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
9 Jan 180969.6DiedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Fedele Grisolia
Archbishop Pietro Fedele Grisolia (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Severina

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016