Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Carelli

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1741¹BornConversano
1 Jun 176524.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Apr 176625.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179756.8SelectedBishop of Conversano, Italy
18 Dec 179756.9ConfirmedBishop of Conversano, Italy
31 Dec 179756.9Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
3 Mar 181877.1DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Carelli
Bishop Gennaro Carelli (born 1741, died ) Bishop of Conversano

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016