Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro De Felice

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1738BornMarciansie
19 Sep 176123.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 179759.4AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
21 Dec 179759.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
Nov 181476.3DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro De Felice:
Bishop Pietro De Felice (born Jul 1738, died Nov 1814) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015