Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Antonio Cardinal Zorzi, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Udine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1745BornCastello di Novegradi
17 Dec 176823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
3 Apr 178640.4AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
17 Apr 178640.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
2 Aug 179246.7SelectedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
24 Sep 179246.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
17 Jan 180357.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 180358.1DiedArchbishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Zorzi:
Pietro Antonio Cardinal Zorzi C.R.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Udine

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
  • a cardinal for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 159, and Page 428
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 12
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Jan 1803

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016