Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Teresio Maria Carlo Vittorio Cardinal Ferrero della Marmora

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saluzzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1757BornTorino
9 Jun 178123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
6 Apr 179638.4SelectedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
27 Jun 179638.6ConfirmedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
3 Jul 179638.7Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
18 May 180345.5ResignedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
1 Feb 180547.2AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
1 Feb 180547.2AppointedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
181759.2ResignedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
9 Apr 182466.4ResignedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
27 Sep 182466.9Elevated to Cardinal
31 Dec 183174.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Teresio Maria Carlo Vittorio Ferrero della Marmora
Teresio Maria Carlo Vittorio Cardinal Ferrero della Marmora (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saluzzo

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
  • a cardinal for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 331
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 151
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1824

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016